HI HB1332 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1332
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources to regularly maintain trails and streams under its jurisdiction on a regular or scheduled basis.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-18-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1332 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1332&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1332_.HTM |