HI HB1312 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1312
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to IAC/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to IAC/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes open voting and educational requirements for condominium association and board members. Requires courts to issue a judgment against a party refusing to participate in the mediation process. Requires certain employees of a managing agent to be licensed in accordance with requirements established by the real estate commission.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to IAC/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1312 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to IAC/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6
SB1316 (Same As) 2017-01-31 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
SB1316 (Same As) 2017-01-31 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1312&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1312_.HTM |