HI SB1316 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1316
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes open voting and educational requirements for condominium association and board members. Requires courts to issue a judgment against a party refusing to participate in the mediation process. Requires certain employees of a managing agent to be licensed in accordance with requirements established by the real estate commission.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1316 (Carry Over) 2017-01-31 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
HB1312 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to IAC/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6
HB1312 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to IAC/CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1316&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB1316_.HTM |