HI HB1308 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1308
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct a study, including a cost analysis, on the necessity and feasibility of establishing an agency within the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to regulate homeowners associations, and to submit a report of its progress to the Legislature prior to the 2018 Regular Session. Appropriates funds. (HB1308 HD3)
Title
Relating To Homeowners Associations.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 335). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1014) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 552) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Quinlan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 152) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Quinlan; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1308 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to CPH, WAM.