HI HB1288 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1288
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes non-voting ex-officio board members appointed by the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives to the HART Board of Directors from being counted for purposes of quorum.
Title
Relating To Government.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 577), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1324 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1288 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
HB1288 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).