HI HB1258 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 216, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes registration requirements and driver's licensing requirements for operation of autocycles. (HB1258 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-13SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 216, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
2017-07-13HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 216, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
2017-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 71).
2017-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 71) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2017-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-21HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:05AM in conference room 225.
2017-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 10:15AM in conference room 225.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Baker Co-Chair; English.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Takumi Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2017-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2017-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 643) in amended form (SD 2).
2017-04-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-07Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
2017-04-07SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1562) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2017-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-03-23SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2017-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2017-03-23SenateReported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1035) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2017-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2017-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to TRE, CPH.
2017-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 333).
2017-03-07HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-03HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
2017-03-03HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-28HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino.
2017-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2017-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
2017-02-17HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 623) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2017-02-08HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2017-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-24HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1258 (Same As) 2017-03-09 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback