HI HB1242 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1242
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the public utilities commission (PUC) to contract with the Hawaii natural energy institute to conduct an independent renewable gas study. Appropriates funds to PUC to contract with the University of Hawaii to perform the study. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/CPH, WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH/EET, WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 282). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 996-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Matsumoto. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 351-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-30-20 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2020-01-23 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-30-20 11:30am. |
2020-01-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-23-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB571 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1242 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 6
HB1242 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 6