HI HB1231 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits wanton waste of wildlife and establishes penalties for commission of the offense. Provides exemptions from the offense for certain persons eradicating or culling wildlife if retrieval of the dead or injured wildlife is unsafe. Requires DLNR to provide public notice prior to authorizing the eradication or culling of wildlife.
Title
Wildlife; Wanton Waste; Penalties; DLNR; Notice
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1231&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1231_.HTM |