HI HB1230 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1230
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the Hawaiian version of a law be held binding if the law in question was originally drafted in Hawaiian and then translated into English.
Title
Relating To Hawaiian As An Official Language Of The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1230 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB211 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21
SB211 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1230&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1230_.HTM |