HI HB1225 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1225
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires coordination to link certain information on social services, organ donor status, and immunization data to the statewide health information exchange. Makes participation in the Hawaii immunization registry mandatory for all providers of immunizations, including COVID-19 vaccines, beginning 08/01/2021.
Title
Relating To Digital Health Records.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1225 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
DOH
Hawaii Health Information Exchange
Hawaii Immunization Registry
State-designated Entity for Health Information Exchange
Hawaii Health Information Exchange
Hawaii Immunization Registry
State-designated Entity for Health Information Exchange
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1225&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1225_.HTM |