HI HB121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB121
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the excise tax rate on large cigars.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB121 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB868 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB177 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
HB868 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB177 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=121&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB121_.HTM |