HI HB1194 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1194
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows home schooled students to participate in extracurricular activities offered at the public school that they would otherwise be required to attend.
Title
Relating To Extracurricular Activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1194 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB318 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB318 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1194&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1194_.HTM |