HI SB318 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB318
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows home schooled students to participate in extracurricular activities offered at the public school that they would otherwise be required to attend. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Extracurricular Activities.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 477) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 2:45PM in conference room 211. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB318 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB1194 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1194 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6