HI HB1185 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1185

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Hawaiian Homes Commission to distribute leases to all beneficiaries within 10 years. Removes financial consideration in obtaining a lease. Requires the construction of pu'uhonuas or communal living arrangements by the department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Distribution Of Leases Under The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act, 1920, As Amended.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-04HouseRe-referred to HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 6
2021-02-01HouseReferred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1185 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Re-referred to HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback