HI HB1185 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1185
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a legislative task force to investigate the application and the accompanying advantages and disadvantages of applying artificial intelligence to Hawaii's economy and government operations.
Title
Relating To Artificial Intelligence Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1185 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EDB/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1185&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1185_.HTM |