HI HB1185 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1185
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to allow each gubernatorial nominee to appoint, following the primary election, a person from the same political party as a running mate for lieutenant governor in the general election.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article V, Section 2, Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB275 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
HB1185 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1185 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1185&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1185_.HTM |