HI HB1185 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the State Constitution by requiring the first principal installment of general obligation bonds and reimbursable general obligation bonds to mature not later than one year from the date of issuance. (HB1185 HD1)
Title
General Obligation Bonds; State Constitution (ConAm)
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 289). |
2015-03-10 | House | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3. |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 807) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 368), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |