HI HB1184 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 188, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 188, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows agencies to rank fewer than three persons for professional services when fewer than three qualified persons respond to the solicitation or request to use alternative procurement procedures when no qualified person responds to the solicitation. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | Senate | Act 188, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291). |
2023-07-05 | House | Act 188, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291). |
2023-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kim. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 70). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 70) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa. |
2023-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-27-23 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 867). |
2023-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Garrett Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Alcos. |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 848) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1797) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1355) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-16-23 3:00PM; CR 225. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 205). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1032), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-14 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1465 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17