HI HB1184 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1184
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures the protection and promotion of the health and well being of all infants born alive the State. Mandates medically appropriate and reasonable life-saving and life-sustaining medical care and treatment to all born alive infants. Provides civil and criminal penalties.
Title
Relating To Born Alive Infants.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1184 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1184&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1184_.HTM |