HI HB1184 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1184

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Ensures the protection and promotion of the health and well being of all infants born alive the State. Mandates medically appropriate and reasonable life-saving and life-sustaining medical care and treatment to all born alive infants. Provides civil and criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Born Alive Infants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1184 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback