HI HB1174 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-16 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-16 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the motion picture, digital media, and film production income tax credit by: (1) Requiring the department of business, economic development, and tourism to publish on its website the names of the qualified productions and the amount of the tax credits certified per qualified production per filing year; (2) Changing the tax credit from a refundable tax credit to a nonrefundable tax credit; and (3) Extending the repeal date of the tax credit from 1/1/2026 to 1/1/2033. Reduces the cap amounts of the renewable energy technologies income tax credit. Retains the current cap amount for community-based renewable energy projects on commercial property. Amendments to the motion picture, digital media, and film production income tax credit apply to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2021. Amendments to the renewable energy technologies income tax credit apply to renewable energy technology systems installed and placed in service after 12/31/2021. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Misalucha, Fevella. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 762) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Chang, Ihara, Nishihara, Rhoads, Taniguchi. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Lee). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1604) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1195) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Lee ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:30PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee on EET has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-19-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 03-19-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 166). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 819), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-03-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1174 (Carry Over) 2021-04-16 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
SB921 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SB921 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).