HI HB1170 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a portion of conveyance tax revenues be deposited into the education design and construction project assessment fund.
Title
Relating To The Conveyance Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1170 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to WAL, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1170&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1170_.HTM |