HI HB1167 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize the department of transportation to pursue a comprehensive six-year modernization program and provides it sufficient resources to implement the plan by amending the state liquid fuel tax, state vehicle registration fee, state vehicle weight fee, and rental motor vehicle surcharge through increases of the various taxes and the flat rate amount in sections 243-4(a), 249-31, 249-33(a), and 251-2(a), Hawaii Revised Statutes. Authorize the implementation of a Vehicle Miles Traveled Pilot Program. Effective 07/01/2020. (HB1167 HD2)
Title
Transportation six-year Modernization Program
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to TIA, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 227). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Berg, Brower, Ching, Coffman, Har, Manahan, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen, Ward, Wooley voting no (11) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-2009. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 895) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-27 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower, Coffman, Har, Wooley, Pine, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-09 11:00am in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Ward voting no (1) and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 559) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Takumi. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-18-09 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB985 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.