HI HB1162 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1162

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Regulates the operation of pet boarding facilities within the State. (HB1162 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Pet Boarding Facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-20HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 416) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt.
2019-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1429 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1162 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback