HI HB1159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the public utilities commission to establish policies and procedures related to retail wheeling to enable independent power producers to sell electricity directly to end users.
Title
Relating To Retail Wheeling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1159 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1159&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1159_.HTM |