HI HB1158 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons aged fifteen years and six months but less than eighteen years of age from engaging in various tasks that distract from the primary task of driving such as, the use of all cell phones (including hands-free devices) and all other electronic devices, consuming food or beverages, engaging in personal grooming (i.e., applying makeup, brushing teeth or shaving), or attempting to reach for any other object or device, while operating a motor vehicle under either a temporary instruction permit or a provisional license.
Title
Highway; Safety; Distracted Driving; Motor Vehicle
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB976 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1158&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1158_.htm |