HI HB1155 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying class A and B felonies that require mandatory minimum prison terms under the repeat offender statute. Reinstating, adding, and deleting certain class C felonies that require the mandatory minimum prison terms under the repeat offender statute. (HB1155 CD1)
Title
Crimes; Repeat Offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). | |
2011-06-27 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-27-11 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-06-27 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 83). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 83) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Hanohano, B. Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Hanohano, B. Oshiro, Souki, Marumoto. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 559) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1124) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-11 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 279). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ching voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fontaine, Har, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (10). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 636) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Ito, Luke, B. Oshiro, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souki, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-01-11. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill re-scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-22-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 302. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |