HI HB1140 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1140
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the issuance of certain new residential multi-family and commercial building application permits and new state building application permits initiated on or after January 1, 2022, unless the building's parking stalls are electric vehicle charger ready. Allows such buildings to implement an electric vehicle energy management system. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1140 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
SB773 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRS/EET, JDC.
SB773 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRS/EET, JDC.