HI SB773 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB773
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRS/EET, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRS/EET, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the issuance of certain new residential multi-family and commercial building application permits and new state building application permits initiated on or after January 1, 2022, unless the building's parking stalls are electric vehicle charger ready. Allows such buildings to implement an electric vehicle energy management system.
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS/EET, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB773 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRS/EET, JDC.
HB1140 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
HB1140 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=773&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB773_.HTM |