HI HB1128 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
During a state of emergency or local state of emergency, provides parameters for delegation of powers and scope and duration of suspension of laws. Provides an advise and consent process for an emergency proclamation to extend beyond one hundred twenty days. Provides a legislative means for an emergency proclamation to be terminated.
Title
Relating To Emergency Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1330 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1128 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1128 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Advise and Consent
Emergency Management
Local State of Emergency
Powers
Proclamation
Scope and Duration
State of Emergency
Emergency Management
Local State of Emergency
Powers
Proclamation
Scope and Duration
State of Emergency
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1128&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1128_.HTM |