HI HB1122 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1122
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies procedures for an exemption from building permit and building code requirements pursuant to section 46-88, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and clarifies that section 46-88 does not exempt any new or existing agricultural buildings, structures, related appurtenances, or other development from local, state, or federal floodplain management development standards, ordinances, codes, statutes, rules, or regulations pursuant to National Flood Insurance Program requirements.
Title
Relating To Exemption For Agricultural Buildings And Structures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1122 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5
SB988 (Same As) 2017-03-09 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB988 (Same As) 2017-03-09 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1122&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1122_.HTM |