HI HB112 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP/HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the time of transfer wastewater system inspection program in the Department of Health to oversee the inspection and repair of any individual wastewater system at the time of sale or transfer of residential real property attached to the wastewater system. Excludes certain sales or transfers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Wastewater Systems.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseReferred to EEP/HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB369 (Same As) 2021-02-26 - The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback