HI HB1117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1117
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Board of Agriculture and the Agribusiness Development Corporation to ensure the timely collection of lease payments, track lessees that are in arrears of lease payments, and offer payment plans for lessees in arears. Authorizes the BLNR to allow payment plans for a breach or default of a lease or patent. Prohibits land leased by the Agribusiness Development Corporation from being assigned or sublet without Corporation approval. (HB1117 HD2)
Title
Relating To State Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 104) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-01-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1117 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).