HI HB1108 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1108
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning July 1, 2022, requires persons who use the Na Ala Hele trail system for commercial purposes and applicants for new and renewal commercial use permits in state parks, small boat harbors, and ocean recreation management areas; instructor/operator permits; and common carrier certificates and contract carrier permits covering the transportation of passengers to hold and annually maintain a sustainable tourism certificate from the Hawaii Ecotourism Association, achieve and maintain green business recognition by the Hawaii Green Business Program, and ensure that at least one-third of staff members employed by the applicant who have direct contact with visitors are certified as professional tour guides. Requires the University of Hawaii to update the certification for professional tour guides curriculum and examination, subject to approval by the aha moku advisory committee, by June 30, 2020, and every ten years thereafter. Requires recertification and renewal of certification for professional tour guides every two years.
Title
Relating To Tourism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TIA, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1108 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB364 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB364 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
... (see document for full report title)
Certificates and Permits Covering Transportation of Persons
Commercial Instructor and Operator Permits
Commercial Use Permits
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hawaii Ecotourism Association
Motor Carriers
Na Ala Hele Trails
Ocean Recreation Management Areas
State Parks
Sustainable Tourism Certificate
Tour Guides
Tourism
Certificates and Permits Covering Transportation of Persons
Commercial Instructor and Operator Permits
Commercial Use Permits
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hawaii Ecotourism Association
Motor Carriers
Na Ala Hele Trails
Ocean Recreation Management Areas
State Parks
Sustainable Tourism Certificate
Tour Guides
Tourism
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1108&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1108_.HTM |