HI HB1104 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits educational institutions and employers, respectively, from requesting a student, prospective student employee, or prospective employee to grant access to, allow observation of, or disclose information that allows access to or observation of personal internet accounts. Provides penalties.
Title
Internet Privacy Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN/HED, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1104&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1104_.HTM |