HI HB1094 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Protective Act to ensure compliance with federal Title IV-E hearing requirements. (HB1094 HD1)
Title
Permanency Hearings
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to HMS, JGO. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 214). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 824), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-02-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-09 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Luke, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita, Wakai. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-13-09 2:20PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 137), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Nishimoto, Shimabukuro, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Ward. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-05-09 8:15 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB912 (Same As) 2011-04-29 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 4:30PM in conference room 229.