HI HB1092 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1092
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Public School Innovation Grants Program to support school-level innovation. Authorizes the Board of Education to administer the Grants Program. Establishes the Public School Innovation Grants Special Fund. Makes appropriations. (HB1092 HD1)
Title
Relating To Public School Innovation Grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 721) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB958 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1092 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB1092 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).