HI HB1090 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 12:00 pm in Conference Room 308 Via Videoconference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends requirements for child passengers. Requires rear facing child safety seats for children less than 2 years of age. Requires the use of child safety seats or booster seats for certain children less than 10 years of age. Raises certain fines for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Child Passenger Restraints.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-16HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
2021-02-16HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 266), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-09HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback