HI HB1087 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1087
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates Hawaii Revised Statutes title 24 by: changing the dollar amount of the benefits, recovery, or compensation obtained or attempted to be obtained for a class C felony, and misdemeanor; requiring insurers seeking a certificate of authority to submit a Uniform Certificate of Authority Application to the Insurance Division and to clarify that the insurer's name must comply with sections 431:3-202(b) and 431:4-104(d)(1); including application and service fees charged to motor vehicle self-insurers; allowing the Insurance Commissioner to issue a declaration before an event that may require the use of nonresident adjusters; complying with the National Association of Insurance Commissioners' Producer Licensing Model Act; allowing third-party claimants to claim the general excise tax and certificate of ownership fee in total loss claims; requiring that certain costs and expenses incurred by the Insurance Commissioner during supervisory proceedings be paid or reimbursed by the assets of the insurer; and making technical, nonsubstantive amendments for clarity and consistency. (HB1087 HD1)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 573) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane. |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:15PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17. |
2017-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1087 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
SB953 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 152, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1253).
SB953 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 152, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1253).
Subjects
Appointments
Certificate of Authority
Certificate of Ownership Fee
Declaration by the Commissioner
Fees
General Excise Tax
Insurance Fraud Violations
Insurance Producer License
Insurer
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Self-Insurance
Nonresident Adjusters
Notification of Termination
Producer Licensing Model Act
S
Third-Party Claimant
Uniform Certificate of Authority Application
Certificate of Authority
Certificate of Ownership Fee
Declaration by the Commissioner
Fees
General Excise Tax
Insurance Fraud Violations
Insurance Producer License
Insurer
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Self-Insurance
Nonresident Adjusters
Notification of Termination
Producer Licensing Model Act
S
Third-Party Claimant
Uniform Certificate of Authority Application