HI HB1087 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1087

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Updates Hawaii Revised Statutes title 24 by: changing the dollar amount of the benefits, recovery, or compensation obtained or attempted to be obtained for a class C felony, and misdemeanor; requiring insurers seeking a certificate of authority to submit a Uniform Certificate of Authority Application to the Insurance Division and to clarify that the insurer's name must comply with sections 431:3-202(b) and 431:4-104(d)(1); including application and service fees charged to motor vehicle self-insurers; allowing the Insurance Commissioner to issue a declaration before an event that may require the use of nonresident adjusters; complying with the National Association of Insurance Commissioners' Producer Licensing Model Act; allowing third-party claimants to claim the general excise tax and certificate of ownership fee in total loss claims; requiring that certain costs and expenses incurred by the Insurance Commissioner during supervisory proceedings be paid or reimbursed by the assets of the insurer; and making technical, nonsubstantive amendments for clarity and consistency. (HB1087 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
2017-02-17HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 573) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-02-15HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane.
2017-02-14HouseBill re-scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:15PM in conference room 329.
2017-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17.
2017-02-09HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-02-09HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17.
2017-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB953 (Same As)
HB1087 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback