HI HB1072 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1072
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a uniform fee for licenses to solemnize marriages.
Title
Relating To Licenses To Solemnize Marriages.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1072 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1370 (Same As) 2023-07-05 - Act 206, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
SB1370 (Same As) 2023-07-05 - Act 206, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1072&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB1072_.HTM |