HI SB1370 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 206, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 206, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a standard license to solemnize marriages, valid for one year from the date of issuance. Establishes a short-term license to solemnize marriages, valid for sixty days from the date of issuance. Establishes a fee of $100 per year for the issuance of a standard license. Establishes a fee of $25 per sixty-day period for a short-term license. Specifies in what amount and to which fund license fees shall be deposited. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Licenses To Solemnize Marriages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | Senate | Act 206, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2023-07-05 | House | Act 206, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23 |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 175) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 175). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tam. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2023-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 3:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 3:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takenouchi Co-Chairs; Tam, Garcia. |
2023-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 911). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Moriwaki. |
2023-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 784). |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2092) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-30 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1363), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-17 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Garcia. |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-17-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 52) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-23. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 698) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 574) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1072 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3