HI HB1071 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1071
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to HRE, JDC.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to HRE, JDC.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the independent audit committee chair of the University of Hawaii board of regents to be selected in a manner consistent with the board's bylaws. Limits the board of regent's flexibility to appoint members with certain skill sets to its independent audit committee. Clarifies the independent audit committee's role relating to enterprise risk management. Exempts the independent audit committee from chapter 91 and part I of chapter 92, HRS, in its discussions with auditors on matters that should remain confidential, in accordance with national best practices, and at the independent audit committee chair's discretion, allow the discussions to be held in the absence of the University of Hawaii president or chief financial officer. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents Independent Audit Committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HRE, JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 281). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 877) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HET, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1071 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HRE, JDC.
SB1225 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Act 172, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).
SB1225 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Act 172, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).