HI HB1071 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1071

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the independent audit committee chair of the University of Hawaii board of regents to be selected in a manner consistent with the board's bylaws. Limits the board of regent's flexibility to appoint members with certain skill sets to its independent audit committee. Clarifies the independent audit committee's role relating to enterprise risk management. Exempts the independent audit committee from chapter 91 and part I of chapter 92, HRS, in its discussions with auditors on matters that should remain confidential, in accordance with national best practices, and at the independent audit committee chair's discretion, allow the discussions to be held in the absence of the University of Hawaii president or chief financial officer. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents Independent Audit Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-11SenateReferred to HRE, JDC.
2021-03-11SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 281).
2021-03-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
2021-03-05HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 877) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-24HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka.
2021-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
2021-02-16HouseReported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-05HouseThe committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to HET, JHA, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1225 (Same As)
HB1071 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HRE, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback