HI HB1036 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Act 041, 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Act 041, 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of public safety to maintain a list of independent civil process servers and amends several statutes to allow process servers to serve specific types of legal documents. (SD2)
Title
A Bill For An Act Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Act 041, 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141). |
2021-06-10 | House | Act 041, on 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141). |
2021-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 614). |
2021-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-21. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2021-04-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Riviere. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi Chair; Todd, Ward. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 745) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1584) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 278). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 757) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1190 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.