HI HB1034 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1034
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the Governor's and mayors' emergency management powers shall be consistent with the state constitution. Clarifies the scope of the comprehensive emergency management plan. Clarifies the powers of the Governor and mayors to extend or terminate a state of emergency. Specifies the status and the allowable uses of Major Disaster Fund moneys, including increasing the amount of the additional funds that may be made available for the purpose of matching federal disaster relief fund from $5,000,000 to $10,000,000. Shortens the duration of price control periods from ninety-six hours to seventy-two hours. Defines the term "severe warning", clarifying that entities other than the National Weather Service issue warnings that may require the activation of the emergency management system. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Emergency Management.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 653) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1332 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
HB1034 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
HB1034 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1034&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1034_HD1_.HTM |