GA SR854 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Reconsidered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Reconsidered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION applying for a convention of the states under Article V of the United States Constitution; and for other purposes.
Title
Article V of the United States Constitution; a convention of the states; apply
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #627 (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #628 (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #629 (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #627 (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #628 (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #629 (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |