GA SR64 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Georgia High School Association to add the 4x800 meter relay to the state track meet; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia High School Association; add the 4x800 meter relay to the state track meet; urge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54466 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/180100 |