GA SR589 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION requesting that the Congress of the United States take legislative action to change the current definition of renewable biomass and prevent the passage of any legislation that would control forest management practices on private forest lands; and for other purposes.
Title
Congress; request legislative action to change the current definition of renewable biomass; forest lands
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Chapman [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. Ralph Hudgens [R] |
Rep. J.B. Powell [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #340 - Resolution Calendar Expressing The Will Of The Senate (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Read and Referred |