GA SR513 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Georgia State Fire Services Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Georgia State Fire Services Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Eugene Pearson [R] |
Rep. Doug Stoner [D] | Sen. Donald Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-31 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-30 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read and Referred |